NJ S993 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2134
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A4493 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A4493 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes expedited partner therapy, under which sexual partners or patients diagnosed with sexually transmitted disease are treated without prior clinical examination.
Title
Authorizes expedited partner therapy, under which sexual partners or patients diagnosed with sexually transmitted disease are treated without prior clinical examination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | Substituted by A4493 (1R) |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2134 (Carry Over) 2016-05-16 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4493 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.336.
A4493 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.336.