NJ SCR106 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-28 - Substituted by ACR135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-28 - Substituted by ACR135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approves FY 2011 Financial Plan of New Jersey Environmental Infrastructure Trust.
Title
Approves FY 2011 Financial Plan of New Jersey Environmental Infrastructure Trust.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-28 | Substituted by ACR135 | |
2010-06-21 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-05-27 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR135 (Same As) 2010-06-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/SCR106 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/SCR/106_I1.HTM |