NJ SCR20 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR59
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR21
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR35
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR103
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR21
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR35
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR103
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendment to constitution regarding parental notification for medical or surgical procedures or treatments relating to pregnancy to be performed on minor children.
Title
Proposes amendment to constitution regarding parental notification for medical or surgical procedures or treatments relating to pregnancy to be performed on minor children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR20 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SCR20 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SCR35 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
ACR123 (Same As) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
ACR103 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
SCR20 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SCR35 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
ACR123 (Same As) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
ACR103 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/SCR20 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/SCR/20_I1.HTM |