NJ SCR25 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR15
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR113
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR48
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR113
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR48
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reconstitutes the "Joint Committee on Economic Justice and Equal Employment Opportunity."
Title
Reconstitutes the "Joint Committee on Economic Justice and Equal Employment Opportunity."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for ACR105 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (67-7-0) |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | Substituted for ACR105 |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR25 (Carry Over) 2018-03-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
SCR25 (Carry Over) 2018-03-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
SCR48 (Carry Over) 2016-03-14 - Filed with Secretary of State
ACR105 (Same As) 2018-03-26 - Substituted by SCR25
SCR25 (Carry Over) 2018-03-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
SCR48 (Carry Over) 2016-03-14 - Filed with Secretary of State
ACR105 (Same As) 2018-03-26 - Substituted by SCR25
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SCR25 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SCR/25_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR25 |