NJ SCR48 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR111
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR126
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR19
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR126
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR19
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to reauthorize "Violence Against Women Act."
Title
Urges Congress to reauthorize "Violence Against Women Act."
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR48 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SCR126 (Carry Over) 2020-08-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
ACR19 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
ACR78 (Same As) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
SCR126 (Carry Over) 2020-08-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
ACR19 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
ACR78 (Same As) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/SCR48 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/SCR/48_I1.HTM |