NJ SCR86 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR72
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR85
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR89
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR85
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR89
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes constitutional amendment requiring Legislature to enact statute authorizing $200 property tax credit for primary residence of volunteer firefighter or first aid squad member.
Title
Proposes constitutional amendment requiring Legislature to enact statute authorizing $200 property tax credit for primary residence of volunteer firefighter or first aid squad member.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR86 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
ACR74 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
SCR85 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
ACR89 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
ACR74 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
SCR85 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
ACR89 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/SCR86 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/SCR/86_I1.HTM |