NJ SCR96 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR125
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR135
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR135
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Public Hearing Held SSG
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Public Hearing Held SSG
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends State Constitution to prohibit slavery or involuntary servitude.
Title
Amends State Constitution to prohibit slavery or involuntary servitude.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Held SSG |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Senate |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR96 (Carry Over) 2020-10-19 - Public Hearing Held SSG
SCR96 (Carry Over) 2020-10-19 - Public Hearing Held SSG
ACR145 (Same As) 2021-03-17 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
SCR96 (Carry Over) 2020-10-19 - Public Hearing Held SSG
ACR145 (Same As) 2021-03-17 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/SCR96 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/SCR/96_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR96 |