NJ SJR106 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR67
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR15
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR15
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "New Jersey Domestic Violence and Legal Access Task Force."
Title
Establishes "New Jersey Domestic Violence and Legal Access Task Force."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR36 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
SJR67 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
AJR15 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
SJR67 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
AJR15 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/SJR106 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/SJR/106_I1.HTM |