NJ SJR107 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR75
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR115
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR115
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates March of each year as "Fibromuscular Dysplasia Awareness Month."
Title
Designates March of each year as "Fibromuscular Dysplasia Awareness Month."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR75 (Carry Over) 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR115 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
AJR168 (Same As) 2024-05-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
AJR115 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
AJR168 (Same As) 2024-05-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/SJR107 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/SJR/107_I1.HTM |