NJ SJR18 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR114
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR133
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR153
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR83
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR133
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR153
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR83
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates November of each year as "Caregivers Awareness Month."
Title
Designates November of each year as "Caregivers Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR18 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR18 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR153 (Carry Over) 2019-10-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR131 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
AJR83 (Carry Over) 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR18 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR153 (Carry Over) 2019-10-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR131 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
AJR83 (Carry Over) 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/SJR18 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/SJR/18_I1.HTM |