NJ SJR28 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR78
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates June of each year as "Scleroderma Awareness Month."
Title
Designates June of each year as "Scleroderma Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR78 (Carry Over) 2019-09-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/SJR28 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/SJR/28_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR28 |