NJ SJR29 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR98
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR111
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR106
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR111
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR106
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates month of October as "Learning Disabilities Awareness Month."
Title
Designates month of October as "Learning Disabilities Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR29 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
SJR29 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
SJR106 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
AJR92 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
SJR29 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
SJR106 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
AJR92 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SJR29 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SJR/29_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR29 |