NJ SJR34 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Approved P.L.2022, JR-2.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Approved P.L.2022, JR-2.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates March as "Triple Negative Breast Cancer Awareness Month."
Title
Designates March as "Triple Negative Breast Cancer Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR135 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR135 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2022, JR-2. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR135 (1R) |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR135 (Same As) 2022-03-24 - Substituted by SJR34 (1R)