NJ SJR36 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR15
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR67
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR115
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR69
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR67
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR115
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR69
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "New Jersey Domestic Violence and Legal Access Task Force."
Title
Establishes "New Jersey Domestic Violence and Legal Access Task Force."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR36 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
SJR36 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
AJR30 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
AJR115 (Carry Over) 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
SJR69 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
SJR36 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
AJR30 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
AJR115 (Carry Over) 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
SJR69 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/SJR36 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/SJR/36_I1.HTM |