NJ SJR38 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-13 - Substituted by AJR11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-13 - Substituted by AJR11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates second full week in April as "Asperger's Syndrome Awareness Week."
Title
Designates second full week in April as "Asperger's Syndrome Awareness Week."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-13 | Substituted by AJR11 | |
2010-11-08 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-05-10 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR11 (Same As) 2011-01-26 - Approved P.L.2011, JR-1.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/SJR38 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/SJR/38_I1.HTM |