NJ SJR57 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR75
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR153
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR39
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR76
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR138
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR153
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR39
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR76
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR138
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates May of each year as "Youth Smoking Prevention and Awareness Month."
Title
Designates May of each year as "Youth Smoking Prevention and Awareness Month."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR57 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR57 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR40 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
SJR39 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR76 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
AJR138 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
SJR57 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR40 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
SJR39 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR76 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
AJR138 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/SJR57 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/SJR/57_I1.HTM |