NJ SJR79 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-14 - Approved P.L.2020, JR-3.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-14 - Approved P.L.2020, JR-3.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates commission to study sexual assault, misconduct, and harassment by staff against inmates in State correctional facilities.
Title
Creates commission to study sexual assault, misconduct, and harassment by staff against inmates in State correctional facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] |
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR167 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2020, JR-3. |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR167 |
2020-06-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-22 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR167 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Substituted by SJR79 (1R)