NJ SR102 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Memorializes Congress and the President of the United States to increase subsidies for federal flood insurance.
Title
Memorializes Congress and the President of the United States to increase subsidies for federal flood insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Christopher Connors [R] | Sen. Kevin O'Toole [R] | Sen. Ronald Rice [D] |
Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (Voice) |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR156 (Same As) 2013-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/SR102 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/SR/102_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SR102 |