NJ SR28 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urges President and Congress to immediately enact legislation establishing veterans regional medical center in southern New Jersey. *
Title
Urges President and Congress to immediately enact legislation establishing veterans regional medical center in southern New Jersey. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-11 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2010-06-10 | Passed by the Senate (Voice) | |
2010-05-27 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR22 (Same As) 2010-01-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee