NJ SR32 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AR19
Note: Carry Foward to future SR21
Note: Carry Over of previous SR68
Note: Carry Foward to future SR21
Note: Carry Over of previous SR68
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Motion To Table (19-15) (Ruiz)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Motion To Table (19-15) (Ruiz)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutes special committee of Senate entitled "Senate Select Committee on the Executive Branch's Response to the COVID-19 Pandemic."
Title
Constitutes special committee of Senate entitled "Senate Select Committee on the Executive Branch's Response to the COVID-19 Pandemic."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-19 | Senate | Motion To Table (19-15) (Ruiz) |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Motion Relieve from Committee (Pennacchio) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SR32 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Motion To Table (19-15) (Ruiz)
SR32 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Motion To Table (19-15) (Ruiz)
SR68 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Motion To Table (25-14) (Weinberg)
AR178 (Same As) 2023-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
SR32 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Motion To Table (19-15) (Ruiz)
SR68 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Motion To Table (25-14) (Weinberg)
AR178 (Same As) 2023-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/SR32 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/SR/32_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/SR32 |