NJ SR68 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-30 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-30 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes contributions and patriotism of Armed Forces Heritage House.
Title
Recognizes contributions and patriotism of Armed Forces Heritage House.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (Voice) |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR96 (Same As) 2013-05-21 - Filed with Secretary of State
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/SR68 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/SR/68_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SR68 |