NJ SR77 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges US FDA to reconsider approval of Zohydro ER pending comprehensive testing.
Title
Urges US FDA to reconsider approval of Zohydro ER pending comprehensive testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-08 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-08 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (Voice) |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR130 (Same As) 2014-06-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/SR77 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/SR/77_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SR77 |