NM HB227 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] DP - PASSED/S (35-2) SGND (Mar.10) Ch.115.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] DP - PASSED/S (35-2) SGND (Mar.10) Ch.115.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School board finance & audit committees
Title
School board finance & audit committees
Sponsors
Rep. Rhonda King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] DP - PASSED/S (35-2) SGND (Mar.10) Ch.115. | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] SFC | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] DP/a - PASSED/H (58-12) | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] DNP-CS/DP-HAFC | |
2010-02-02 | [LD 11] germane- - prntd- ref HEC/HAFC-HEC | |
2010-01-26 | [LD 6] not prntd-HRC |