NM HB295 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Electronic & online promotion of prostitution
Title
Electronic & online promotion of prostitution
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Lewis [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-28 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Passed House (67-0) |
2013-03-01 | House | [LD 34] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-13 | House | [LD 22] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | House | [LD 22] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2013-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary |