NM HB295 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 52
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 52
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Licensing Board Membership & Sunsets
Title
Licensing Board Membership & Sunsets
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Bandy [R] | Rep. George Dodge [D] | Rep. Jimmie Hall [R] | Rep. Jason Harper [R] |
Rep. Lorenzo Larranaga [R] | Rep. Patricia Lundstrom [D] | Rep. Nick Salazar [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-19 | House | [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 52 |
2017-02-19 | Senate | [LD 34] Passed Senate (33-5) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (61-0) |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] HSIVC |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] HSIVC and then to House Business & Industry |