NM HB353 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Passed Senate (38-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.202 (partial veto).
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Passed Senate (38-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.202 (partial veto).
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Capital outlay project reauthorizations
Title
Capital outlay project reauthorizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Passed Senate (38-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.202 (partial veto). |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (62-0) |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-30 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |