NM HB57 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - [LD 17] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - [LD 17] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Livestock crimestoppers act
Title
Livestock crimestoppers act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | [LD 17] DP API. | |
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] DP-SJC | |
2010-02-01 | [LD 10] SCONC/SJC-SCONC | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] DNP-CS/DP - PASSED/H (67-0) | |
2010-01-22 | [LD 4] DP-HJC | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] ref HAGC/HJC-HAGC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] not prntd-HRC |