NM HJR2 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] h and then to cncrd Signed by one or both houses (C.A. 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] h and then to cncrd Signed by one or both houses (C.A. 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School election timing, ca
Title
School election timing, ca
Sponsors
Rep. James Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 50 N: 7 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 50 N: 7 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 55] h and then to cncrd Signed by one or both houses (C.A. 1). |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Rules |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary |
2013-02-15 | House | [LD 24] Passed House (50-7) |
2013-02-12 | House | [LD 21] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-28 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-01-28 | House | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Voters & Elections |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Voters & Elections and then to House Judiciary |
2013-01-15 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |