NM HJR26 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-19 - [LD 26] h and then to cncrd Signed by one or both houses (C.A. 5).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-19 - [LD 26] h and then to cncrd Signed by one or both houses (C.A. 5).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Independent public defender dept., ca
Title
Independent public defender dept., ca
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-19 | [LD 26] h and then to cncrd Signed by one or both houses (C.A. 5). | |
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Passed Senate (26-15) | |
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Referred to Senate Rules | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Passed House (55-13) | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Referred to House Judiciary | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] Referred to House Voters & Elections | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] Assigned to House Voters & Elections and then to House Judiciary |