NM SB217 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Severance Tax Bond Fund Distributions
Title
Severance Tax Bond Fund Distributions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2024-02-14 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:0 |
2024-02-13 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-02-12 | House | Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC |
2024-02-11 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:34 N:0 |
2024-02-10 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-01-26 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/STBTC/SFC |