NM SB390 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Film Tax Credit "production Facility"
Title
Film Tax Credit "production Facility"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-19 | Senate | [LD 34] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (51-11) |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Taxation & Revenue |
2017-02-09 | Senate | [LD 24] Passed Senate (37-2) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-27 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-01-27 | Senate | [LD 11] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |