NM SJM28 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-18 - [LD 25] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-18 - [LD 25] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study state fair leases
Title
Study state fair leases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-18 | [LD 25] Action postponed indefinitely | |
2012-02-18 | [LD 25] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-18 | [LD 25] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs | |
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Passed Senate (36-0) | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Public Affairs | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Rules | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=JM&legno=28&year=12 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/12%20Regular/memorials/senate/SJM028.pdf |