NV AB220 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Chapter 210. (Effective June 6, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Chapter 210. (Effective June 6, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water; authorizing a district board of health to establish a program to pay the costs for property owners with a septic system to connect to a community sewerage disposal system under certain circumstances; revising provisions relating to a permit to operate a water system; revising provisions relating to water systems; revising provisions relating to tentative maps and final maps for a subdivision of land; establishing minimum standards for certain landscaping irrigation fixtures in new construction and expansions and renovations in certain structures; revising provisions relating to grants of money for water conservation; exempting the use of water by certain entities to extinguish fires in an emergency from provisions governing the appropriation of water; revising provisions relating to groundwater in certain designated areas; revising conditions under which the State Engineer may require the plugging of certain wells used for domestic purposes; defining certain terms relating to the Conservation of Colorado River Water Act; authorizing the Board of Directors of the Southern Nevada Water Authority to enact certain restrictions on water use for single-family residences under certain circumstances; prohibiting, with certain exceptions, the use of the waters of the Colorado River for certain purposes; establishing requirements relating to an irrigation water efficiency monitoring program; revising certain provisions relating to the use of the waters of the Colorado River to irrigate nonfunctional turf; authorizing the Authority to operate a program to convert properties using a septic system to a municipal sewer system and to impose a fee for such a program; authorizing the Board of Directors to authorize the General Manager of the Authority to restrict the use of water under certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to water conservation. (BDR 40-337)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Assembly | Chapter 210. (Effective June 6, 2023) |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Senate Amendment Nos. 712 and 735 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. To Assembly. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | To printer. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 3, Excused: 1.) |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 735.) |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 712.) To printer. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 12.) To Senate. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 203.) To printer. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |