NV SB110 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 107.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 107.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the process for a change of name. (BDR 3-142)
Title
Revises provisions governing the process for a change of name. (BDR 3-142)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 107. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Prefiled. |