NV SB242 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Chapter 377. (Effective June 12, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Chapter 377. (Effective June 12, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to controlled substances; requiring the Department of Health and Human Services to establish the Psychedelic Medicines Working Group to study certain issues relating to the therapeutic use of entheogens during the 2023-2024 interim; prescribing the membership and duties of the Working Group; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires the Department of Health and Human Services to establish the Psychedelic Medicines Working Group. (BDR S-39)
Sponsors
Sen. Rochelle Nguyen [D] | Sen. Fabian Donate [D] | Rep. Max Carter [D] | Rep. Elaine Marzola [D] |
Sen. Edgar Flores [D] | Sen. Ira Hansen [R] | Sen. Dallas Harris [D] | Sen. James Ohrenschall [D] |
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | Senate | Chapter 377. (Effective June 12, 2023) |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2023-06-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 4, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 354.) Taken from General File. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Notice of exemption. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |