NV SB276 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 534.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 534.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to collection agencies; requiring a collection agency to display certain information on the Internet website of the collection agency; authorizing a collection agent to work from a remote location under certain circumstances; revising certain terminology related to collection agencies; revising the entities required to obtain a license as a collection agency and the circumstances under which such a license is required; revising provisions governing certain records and an application for and the issuance of a license as a collection agency; revising the frequency of the determination of the amount of the bond or substitute for a bond that a collection agency is required to maintain; eliminating certain examinations; removing a requirement that a collection agency obtain a permit for a branch office; revising provisions relating to the application and issuance of a compliance manager's certificate; prohibiting the compliance manager of a collection agency from being simultaneously employed by another collection agency or exempt entity as a compliance manager; exempting certain debt buyers from certain provisions governing collection agencies; revising provisions related to certain annual reports; prohibiting certain actions by a collection agency, compliance manager or collection agent; repealing certain provisions governing foreign collection agencies and certificates; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions related to collection agencies. (BDR 54-158)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 534. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 926 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-06-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 926.) To printer. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | To printer. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 782.) |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 155.) Taken from General File. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |