NV SB545 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 536.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 536.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state financial administration; revising the distribution of the proceeds of the excise tax on retail sales of marijuana and marijuana products; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the distribution of certain tax proceeds. (BDR 32-1241)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Senate | Chapter 536. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |