NY A00475 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-20 - signed chap.149
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-20 - signed chap.149
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a registered physician assistant to conduct the required biennial examination of bus drivers.
Title
Authorizes a registered physician assistant to conduct the required biennial examination of bus drivers.
Sponsors
Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Peter Rivera [D] |
Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-20 | Senate | signed chap.149 |
2011-07-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.818 |
2011-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4999 |
2011-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-05-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.293 |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04999 (Same As) 2011-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A475