NY A03780 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the power authority of the state of New York shall make low cost hydropower available to hospitals located within the counties of Niagara and Orleans.
Title
Establishes the power authority of the state of New York shall make low cost hydropower available to hospitals located within the counties of Niagara and Orleans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2015-04-01 | Assembly | print number 3780a |
2015-04-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2015-01-27 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S04414 (Same As) 2016-05-10 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE