NY A04411 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - held for consideration in corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - held for consideration in corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the public service commission to retain an independent auditor to conduct audits of private water utility companies prior to and after rate changes are approved by the public service commission.
Title
Requires the public service commission to retain an independent auditor to conduct audits of private water utility companies prior to and after rate changes are approved by the public service commission.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Montesano [R] | Asm. Charles Lavine [D] | Asm. Edward Ra [R] | Asm. Michael Miller [D] |
Asm. David McDonough [R] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Assembly | held for consideration in corporations, authorities and commissions |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S00020 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE