NY A05318 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-16 - substituted by s3968
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-16 - substituted by s3968
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a dementia and Alzheimer's disease program database.
Title
Establishes a dementia and Alzheimer's disease program database.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Assembly | substituted by s3968 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.347 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.347 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-02-18 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S03968 (Same As) 2015-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.257