NY A07194 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certificates of relief from disabilities issued by courts or by the department of corrections and community supervision.
Title
Relates to certificates of relief from disabilities issued by courts or by the department of corrections and community supervision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1270 |
2024-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3176 |
2024-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.427 |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2023-05-12 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S03176 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7194