NY A08851 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-04 - signed chap.310
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-04 - signed chap.310
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes participation in the Seymour public library district by that portion of the town of Fleming located within the boundaries of the Auburn enlarged city school district.
Title
Authorizes participation in the Seymour public library district by that portion of the town of Fleming located within the boundaries of the Auburn enlarged city school district.
Sponsors
Asm. Gary Finch [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-04 | signed chap.310 | |
2010-08-03 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-24 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-24 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-24 | 3RD READING CAL.1128 | |
2010-06-24 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5909 | |
2010-06-15 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-06-15 | delivered to senate | |
2010-06-15 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-15 | ordered to third reading rules cal.134 | |
2010-06-15 | rules report cal.134 | |
2010-06-15 | reported | |
2010-06-15 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-06-03 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-01-06 | referred to libraries and education technology | |
2009-06-11 | referred to libraries and education technology |
Same As/Similar To
S5909 (Same As) 2010-06-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8851