NY A09284 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 20 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-08-20 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 20 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-08-20 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the residency requirement for certain assistant district attorney positions within Saratoga County; provides such exemption does not apply to the positions of first assistant district attorney or chief assistant district attorney.
Title
Exempts the residency requirement for certain assistant district attorney positions within Saratoga County; provides such exemption does not apply to the positions of first assistant district attorney or chief assistant district attorney.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2024-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.872 |
2024-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8634 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.474 |
2024-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2024-02-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S08634 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9284