NY A10025 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-13 - signed chap.352
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-13 - signed chap.352
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To exempt the Long Island Progressive Missionary Baptist Churches General Association from liability for payment of certain real property taxes for property owned by the Long Island Progressive Missionary Baptist Churches General Association in the Town of Babylon.
Title
Authorizes the Long Island Progressive Missionary Baptist Churches General Association to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-13 | signed chap.352 | |
2010-08-03 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-17 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-17 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-16 | 3RD READING CAL.912 | |
2010-06-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6975A | |
2010-06-15 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-06-15 | delivered to senate | |
2010-06-15 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-15 | ordered to third reading rules cal.147 | |
2010-06-15 | rules report cal.147 | |
2010-06-15 | reported | |
2010-06-15 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-05-18 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-04-30 | print number 10025a | |
2010-04-30 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | |
2010-02-24 | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S6975 (Same As) 2010-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10025A