NY A10025 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to compulsive gambling assistance.
Title
Relates to compulsive gambling assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.231 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.231 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-05-15 | Assembly | print number 10025a |
2012-05-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2012-05-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-05-01 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S07304 (Same As) 2012-06-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
S07795 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
S07795 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES