NY A10349 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - signed chap.190
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - signed chap.190
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage monkfish until December 31, 2027.
Title
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage monkfish until December 31, 2027.
Sponsors
Asm. Sam Berger [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Assembly | signed chap.190 |
2024-07-02 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2024-05-28 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-28 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1325 |
2024-05-28 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9340 |
2024-05-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.139 |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.139 |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-18 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S09340 (Same As) 2024-05-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10349