NY A10551 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-05 - signed chap.90
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-05 - signed chap.90
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a residential reassessment exemption for the town of Greenburgh in the county of Westchester.
Title
Relates to a residential reassessment exemption for the town of Greenburgh in the county of Westchester.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | signed chap.90 |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1860 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8143 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.378 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.378 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | print number 10551a |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S08143 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10551A