NY S01824 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to affordable housing corporation grants by increasing the amount that can be granted to a high cost project.
Title
Relates to affordable housing corporation grants by increasing the amount that can be granted to a high cost project.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.458 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1824B |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1824A |
2019-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06277 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.234