NY S03141 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes broadband franchises in cities with a population of one million or more.
Title
Authorizes broadband franchises in cities with a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-01 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3141C |
2021-05-10 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3141B |
2021-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.598 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3141A |
2021-03-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-02-24 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06390 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions